Charity overview OWEN JONES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity number: 218916-4
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 21 SEPTEMBER 1976 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 15 MAY 1990 AND 28 SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS OF EITHER SEX WHO HAVE NOT ATTAINED THE AGE OF 25 YEARS AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, IN THE FOLLOWING ORDER OR PRIORITY A) BENEFICIACIES WHOSE FATHERS ARE OR IF DEAD WERE AT THE DATE OF DEATH FREEMAN OF THE CITY OF CHESTER AND MEMBERS OF ONE OF THE CITY COMPANIES; B) BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE ATTENDING OR HAVE ATTENDED A SCHOOL IN THE CITY OF CHESTER AND WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF CHESTER; IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (A) IN AWARDING TO BENEFICIARIES SCHOLARSHIPS, GRANTS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR COLLEGE OF EDUCATION OR OTHER PLACE OR LEARNING APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES; (B) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO HELP BENEFICIARIES ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT TO PREPARE FOR, OR TO ENTER, A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING; (C) IN AWARDING BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO TRAVEL WHETHER IN THIS COUNTRY OR ABROAD IN ORDER TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION; (D) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS; (E) IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 18 June 1963: Standard registration
- 15 October 1999: Removed (Registered in error)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.