Charity overview ELIZABETH GIBSON
Charity number: 220596-2
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 9 AUGUST 1929 AND 5 NOVEMBER 1963 15 JULY 1992
Charitable objects
SUBSIDIARY TRANSFERRED TO 261616- FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF SUTTON.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF SUTTON
Registration history
- 11 March 1964: Standard registration
- 21 January 1994: Removed
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.