Register of Charities - The Charity Commission EDWARD TALLIS

Charity number: 221627-11
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 26 AUGUST 1879, 23 MARCH 1897, 28 NOVEMBER 1911, 30 SEPTEMBER 1932
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KNOWLE
Registration history
  • 28 July 1964: Standard registration
  • 16 November 1994: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of