Charity overview EDWARD TALLIS
Charity number: 221627-11
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 26 AUGUST 1879, 23 MARCH 1897, 28 NOVEMBER 1911, 30 SEPTEMBER 1932
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KNOWLE
Registration history
- 28 July 1964: Standard registration
- 16 November 1994: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.