Charity overview CHARITY OF PETER LATHOM
Charity number: 226897-1
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 21 MARCH 1890, 16 SEPTEMBER 1949 AND 18 MARCH 1952
Charitable objects
ASSISTANCE OF DISCHARGED PRISONERS PRIMARILY WHO HAVE BEEN IMPRISONED IN PRESTON PRISON; OR WHO HAD BEEN COMMITTED FROM MAGISTRATES COURTS PREFERABLY WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF PRESTON OR THE COUNTY OF LANCASTER.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF PRESTON OR THE COUNTY OF LANCASTER
Registration history
- 19 March 1964: Standard registration
- 23 February 2001: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 23 February 2001: Funds transferred to 226171-17 NACRO CHARITY FOR PRISONERS AND FAMILIES OF SERVIN...
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.