Charity overview ST ROSES CONVENT, STROUD
Charity number: 228848-2
Removed charity
Governing document
DEEDS OF 10TH JUNE 1915, 22ND JULY 1921, 1ST SEPT., 1923, SCHEME OF 29TH JULY 1945 AND FURTHER DEEDSOF 10TH MARCH 1945 AND 6TH DECEMBER 1950.
Charitable objects
RELIGIOUS CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF THE CONGREGATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
- 22 August 1963: Standard registration
- 02 September 1992: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.