Charity overview EDMUND AND THOMAS JUSTICE
Charity number: 203538-4
Linked charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 22 JULY 1910 AND VARYING SCHEMES OF 24 FEBRUARY 1939, 28 AUGUST 1953 AND 5 OCTOBER 1961 AS MODIFIED BY RESOLUTION UNDER CHARITIES ACT 1985 DATED 15 FEBRUARY 1990.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF BLEWBURY.
Registration history
- 18 April 1962: Standard registration
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.