Charity overview GEORGE SIMPSON
Charity number: 203927-2
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME 2.2.1923 AND 19.9.1946 AS AMENDED 14.8.1957
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE BOROUGH OF DEVIZES.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF DEVIZES
Registration history
- 12 April 1962: Standard registration
- 25 August 1995: Removed
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.