Register of Charities - The Charity Commission THE CHOLERA FUND
Charity number: 203961-1
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 12 APRIL 1911 AND 22 AUGUST 1950
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF WOODBURY.
FUNDS TRANSFERRED TO CONTITUENT NO.7 (JOHN GULLETT GEARE CHARITY) CA 85 S.3 RESOLUTION 16/01/1990.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF WOODBURY
Registration history
- 09 April 1962: Standard registration
- 28 April 1992: Removed
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.