Charity overview THE CHOLERA FUND

Charity number: 203961-1
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 12 APRIL 1911 AND 22 AUGUST 1950
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF WOODBURY. FUNDS TRANSFERRED TO CONTITUENT NO.7 (JOHN GULLETT GEARE CHARITY) CA 85 S.3 RESOLUTION 16/01/1990.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF WOODBURY
Registration history
  • 09 April 1962: Standard registration
  • 28 April 1992: Removed
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of