Charity overview ROSEBANK
Charity number: 244700-14
Removed charity
Governing document
DEED OF TRUST DATE 16TH FEBRUARY 1895. COMMITTEE MINUTE 20TH OCTOBER 1949 AS AMENDED ON 15 JUNE 1993 BY RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 44 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1992.
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE PAID TO THE INCUMBENT OF ST. PETER, SOUTHBOROUGH FOR PAROCHIAL PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 27 September 1965: Standard registration
- 24 September 1996: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.