Charity overview ROBERT ASH AND SAMPSON LEACROFT
Charity number: 244742-9
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 28 MAY 1869, 6 OCTOBER 1893 AND 17 APRIL 1962. AS AMENDED 21 NOVEMBER 1994.
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF STONE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STONE
Registration history
- 22 September 1965: Standard registration
- 31 May 1995: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.