Charity overview ELIZABETH BALDWIN
Charity number: 244916-1
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 5 JULY 1967 AND 12 SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF FREEMEN OF THE STATIONERS' AND NEWSPAPER MAKERS' COMPANY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
PRIOR TO SCHEME OF 5/7/1967 REGISTERED UNDER 215280
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 11 July 1963: Standard registration
- 03 October 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.