Financial history THE TRANQUILITY HOUSE TRUST

Charity number: 201815
Charity reporting is up to date (90 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.20k £26.71k £31.10k £31.77k £29.12k
Total expenditure £28.88k £24.44k £37.79k £21.00k £40.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A