Financial history VILLAGE HALL OTHERWISE KNOWN AS THE MORCHARD BISHOP MEMORIAL HALL

Charity Number: 201849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £7.95k £19.54k £16.19k £8.54k £21.42k
Total expenditure £14.42k £25.53k £15.79k £8.50k £12.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k £10.67k N/A N/A