Accounts and annual returns THE THREE GRAND PRINCIPLES LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity number: 201887
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 09 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 17 March 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 30 March 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 17 February 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window