Financial history L D C TRUST

Charity number: 202268
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £2.02k £2.61k £3.04k £2.82k £1.29k
Total expenditure £93 £10 £0 £0 £455
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A