Accounts and annual returns BICKLEIGH VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 202334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 November 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required