Accounts and annual returns STADHAMPTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 203235
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 February 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 February 2023 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 March 2021 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required