Financial history CORPORATE HEALTH LIMITED

Charity number: 203521
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £2.64m £2.48m £2.19m £2.06m £1.86m
Total expenditure £2.74m £3.07m £2.81m £2.56m £2.13m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £199.37k £199.37k £199.37k £199.37k £199.37k
Income - Other trading activities £25.10k £39.32k £206.16k £4.53k £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.38m £2.22m £1.75m £1.84m £1.65m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £47.13k £38.55k £29.03k £19.61k £11.78k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.72m £3.05m £2.59m £2.55m £2.12m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £8.21k £8.03k £9.79k £8.29k £14.97k
Expenditure - Grants institution £10.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £8.82k £7.26k £4.55k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0