Accounts and annual returns MARGARET ROBSON TRUST

Charity number: 203656
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 23 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 27 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 08 August 2006 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2004 22 November 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 22 November 2004 On Time