Trustees FREE GARDENS
Charity number: 203850

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Brian Phillips | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hywel Evans | Trustee | 10 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Harrison | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Humphrey Gravell | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Todd | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Toby Russell Sturgis | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Harper | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Barker | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Meriel Matear Griffiths | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.