Accounts and annual returns WIDOW'S ACRE CHARITY

Charity Number: 204702
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2010 26 May 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 20 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 11 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required