Accounts and annual returns JANE ST ALBYNS' CHARITY

Charity Number: 204734
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 22 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required