Financial history LOCKINGE AND ARDINGTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 204770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.51k £5.59k £5.69k £5.97k £6.36k
Total expenditure £4.63k £5.09k £4.22k £3.87k £4.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A