Financial history THE MCCANDLESS EX-SERVICE MEN MEMORIAL HOMES

Charity number: 205848
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.10k £9.10k £9.10k £9.10k £0
Total expenditure £7.97k £10.95k £8.42k £10.93k £1.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A