Accounts and annual returns JOHN CLIFTON'S CHARITY

Charity number: 206404
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 09 May 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 09 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 13 February 2006 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required