Financial history MRS L J WALKER'S CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 206445
Charity reporting is overdue by 1183 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £7.96k £8.19k £9.20k £9.50k £7.99k
Total expenditure £5.91k £6.39k £9.31k £8.99k £8.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A