Accounts and annual returns SIR JAMES MARTIN LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity Number: 206838
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2014 11 October 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2013 20 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2012 17 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2011 29 November 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required