Accounts and annual returns THE MEMORIAL BAND TRUST FUND

Charity number: 207398
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 01 October 2011 17 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2010 16 August 2011 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2009 08 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not Required