Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF WHITEFRIARS OXFORD FUND

Charity number: 207738
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 August 2024 203 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 August 2024 203 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 June 2022 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 June 2022 130 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window