Accounts and annual returns THE ROYAL BLIND SOCIETY FOR THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 207827
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2009 22 February 2011 207 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 22 February 2011 207 days late
Annual return 31 March 2008 31 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 05 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 29 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 10 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 31 January 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 20 March 2006 48 days late