Financial history THE NATIONAL FRIENDSHIP FUND

Charity Number: 207898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.66k £8.08k £4.48k £4.69k £5.72k
Total expenditure £2.60k £6.80k £6.55k £8.32k £7.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A