Accounts and annual returns GEORGE SAVAGE

Charity number: 208167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 30 December 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2023 01 February 2024 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 20 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 24 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 23 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required