Accounts and annual returns CHARLOTTE TETLEY IN CONNEXTION WITH TOC H

Charity number: 209122
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 31 March 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 31 March 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 02 April 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 02 April 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 30 March 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 30 March 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 10 October 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 10 October 2005 On Time