Accounts and annual returns FUEL ALLOTMENT (OR POOR'S ALLOTMENT)

Charity number: 209364
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 October 2019 273 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 February 2017 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required