Accounts and annual returns COFFEE BUYERS BENEVOLENT SOCIETY

Charity number: 209669
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 19 August 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 16 November 2007 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 22 December 2005 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required