Accounts and annual returns THE CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 209933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 25 March 2024 04 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 25 March 2023 04 September 2024 223 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 25 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 25 March 2021 08 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 25 March 2020 11 February 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 25 March 2020 Not Required