ELIZABETH FULLER'S CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 27 October 1995: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF THE 24TH JUNE 1862 AND 24TH OCTOBER 1916 AND VARYING SCHEME OF THE 4TH APRIL 1963
Charitable objects
(A) 29/35THS OF INCOME TO BE PAID HALF-YEARLY TO THE MINISTER OR PASTOR OF THE HIGH STREET BAPTIST CHAPEL IN SAFFRON WALDEN. (B) 6/35THS OF INCOME TO BE APPLIED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR MEMBERS OF THE CONGREGATION OF THE SAID CHAPEL IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. (C) DURING THE PERIOD OF ANY VACANCY IN THE OFFICE OF MINISTER OR PASTOR IN THE SAID CHAPEL, THE SHARE OF INCOME APPLICABLE THERETO SHALL BE APPLIED DURING THE FIRST TWELVE MONTHS OF THE PERIOD IN OR TOWARDS THE PROVISION OF COSTS OF OBTAINING OCCASIONAL MINISTERS TO CONDUCT THE SERVICES IN THE CHAPEL AND FOR THE REMAINDER OF THE PERIOD BE INVESTED IN AUGMENTATION OF THE ENDOWMENTS OF THE CHARITIES.
Area of benefit
SAFFRON WALDEN AND DISTRICT
Linked charities
- 22 September 1962 : Standard registration
- 27 October 1995 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.