Accounts and annual returns DAVID LLOYD'S CHARITY

Charity Number: 210705
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2006 05 June 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 28 July 2004 28 September 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 July 2004 Not Required