Governing document THOMAS ALMOND
Charity Number: 211584
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 5 FEB. 1884, ORDER UNDER L.G.A. OF 12 JULY 1985 AS VARIED SCHEMES OF 29 OCT. 1964 AND 24 NOV. 1966 AND CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME OF 7TH MARCH 2001.
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF BLACKMORE.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
PARISH OF BLACKMORE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.