Accounts and annual returns EMILY AND ELLEN DAVIS CHARITY

Charity number: 212084
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 24 May 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 01 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 01 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 05 May 2009 186 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required