Financial history THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE PLYMOUTH PYSCHIATRIC SERVICES

Charity Number: 212120
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £732 £2.08k £2.63k £4.53k £6.06k
Total expenditure £4.26k £2.33k £2.96k £6.91k £6.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A