Accounts and annual returns NORTH CRAY ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES

Charity number: 213199
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2008 29 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2007 13 September 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2006 21 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2005 29 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2004 17 August 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2004 Not Required