Financial history HIGH HALDEN WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 213310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £14.96k £21.45k £9.83k £10.59k £10.13k
Total expenditure £9.74k £10.52k £12.36k £10.37k £15.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.50k £18.19k N/A N/A N/A