Accounts and annual returns THE PAX HUMANA LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 213503
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2013 25 September 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2013 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2012 15 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2012 Not Required