Accounts and annual returns THE POLISH BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 213673
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 21 October 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 28 October 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 29 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 29 October 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2005 30 October 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 30 October 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 09 November 2006 374 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 02 December 2005 32 days late