Accounts and annual returns BRITISH MOTORING SPORT RELIEF FUND

Charity number: 213939
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2007 24 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2006 18 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2006 18 July 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2005 23 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2005 23 September 2005 On Time
Annual return 31 January 2004 09 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2004 09 July 2004 On Time