Financial history THE METCALFE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 213982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £95.75k £60.10k £21.26k £32.62k £54.36k
Total expenditure £103.36k £108.67k £85.68k £106.90k £110.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A