Financial history MRS LEVETT'S CHARITY

Charity number: 214112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £13.80k £12.31k £18.63k £16.34k £17.78k
Total expenditure £25.75k £12.33k £14.05k £17.83k £17.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A